HI SB6 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Protects agriculturally suitable lands within the State of Hawaii (lands with productivity ratings of "A" or "B").
Title
Agricultural Lands
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Wakai, Slom. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL deferred the measure until 02-01-11 2:55PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Referred to AGL, WLH. | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=6 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB6_.HTM |