HI SB597 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB597
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes income received from deferred compensation retirement plans from the state income tax for taxpayers who meet certain income requirements. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-22 | House | The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-22-23 9:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 207) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1001) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 41) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Keith-Agaran. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to LBT, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB825 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB597 (Carry Over) 2023-03-22 - The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB597 (Carry Over) 2023-03-22 - The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.