HI SB597 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a five-year pilot program to allow qualified psychologists limited authority to prescribe psychotropic medications to patients under the care of the psychologist at a federally qualified health center. Repeals June 30, 2016. (SD2)
Title
Prescriptive Authority; Psychologists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 140) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kidani, Ryan, Solomon . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom, Wakai). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Hee). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 693) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-02 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon. | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-02-11 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-01-11 9:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 425) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-11 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HTH, CPN. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |