HI SB596 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a civil violation for possession by a person 18 years of age or older of one ounce or less of marijuana that is subject to a fine of not more than $100, and establishes an adjudicatory structure for its enforcement. Deletes reporting requirements of board of education for students possessing one ounce or less of marijuana. Clarifies that medical marijuana patients and primary caregiver may assert affirmative defense to prosecution, criminal or civil, involving possession of one ounce or less of marijuana under certain conditions. Excludes possession of one ounce or less of marijuana from authority of Hawaii paroling authority to require paroled prisoner to undergo and complete substance abuse treatment. Excludes possession of more than one ounce of marijuana from authority of courts to require a defendant to undergo and complete substance abuse treatment for probation violation. Clarifies definition of detrimental drug to exclude one ounce or less of marijuana. Excludes possession of one ounce or less of marijuana from offenses of promoting a detrimental drug in the second degree and third degree. Clarifies a civil violation for possession of marijuana does not constitute a prior offense for purposes of the conditional discharge law. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Marijuana; Civil Penalties for Possession of One Ounce or Less
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 511) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Gabbard. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-15 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |