HI SB591 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB591
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds for construction and infrastructure development projects to provide affordable housing units for middle class and low income residents. Allows moneys from the conveyance tax and the county surcharge on state tax to be used to repay the bonds.
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from TRE/HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 421) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-17 2:55PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRE/HOU, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB591 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
HB869 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).
HB869 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).
Subjects
Affordable Housing
Appropriation ($)
Conveyance Tax
Department of Hawaiian Home Lands
Hawaii Housing Finance Development Corporation
Hawaii Public Housing Authority
Appropriation ($)
Conveyance Tax
Department of Hawaiian Home Lands
Hawaii Housing Finance Development Corporation
Hawaii Public Housing Authority
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=591&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB591_.HTM |