HI SB584 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB584
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes from the standard condominium proxy form the option of giving a proxy vote to the board of directors of a condominium association as a whole. Removes the authority of a board to use association funds to solicit proxies as part of the distribution of proxies.
Title
Relating To Condominium Proxy Voting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB584 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to CPN.
HB377 (Same As) 2023-02-02 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB377 (Same As) 2023-02-02 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=584&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB584_.HTM |