HI SB582 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB582
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "water pollutant" as used in chapter 342D, Hawaii Revised Statutes, relating to water pollution, to include plastic. Effective 5/6/2137. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-16 | House | Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 234) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 651) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 29) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB582 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 26