HI SB582 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the office of Hawaiian affairs the trustee of any unclaimed kuleana lands. Prohibits quieting title to kuleana lands or claiming kuleana lands by adverse possession. (SD1)
Title
Quiet Title; Adverse Possession; Kuleana Lands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 102) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2009-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Tokuda, Bunda, Fukunaga, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kokubun, Takamine. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-09 2:45 pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to WTL, JGO. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |