HI SB576 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB576
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-23 - Referred to PSM/TRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-23 - Referred to PSM/TRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a county with a population greater than 500,000 to extend the county surcharge on state tax beyond December 31, 2027. After full completion of the mass transit project, permits counties to use the surcharge on state tax for operation and maintenance of the mass transit project, existing public transportation, or public road and highway repairs. Deducts one-third of the amount from the gross proceeds of a county's surcharge on state tax to reimburse the State for costs associated with handling the assessment, collection, and disposition of the county surcharge on state tax and fund various State transportation projects. Repeals the sunset date of the county surcharge on state tax levied by the city and county of Honolulu. Takes effect January 1, 2018.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TRE, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB576 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to PSM/TRE, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=576&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB576_.HTM |