HI SB576 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires mediation for the purpose of attempting to avoid foreclosure before foreclosure by action or by power of sale may take place; makes conforming amendments; creates and funds the position of mortgage mediation administrator in the center for alternative dispute resolution.
Title
Mortgage Foreclosure; Mandatory Mediation
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] |
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-04 | (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-04-11 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-11 8:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to CPN, JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=576 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB576_.HTM |