HI SB572 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB572
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the imposition of a criminal fine for violations of the State's aquatic resources law. Permits the department of land and natural resources to recommend community service that benefits the resource damaged when a person is ordered to perform community service in lieu of a fine. Allows for a fine up to $1,000 to be levied for all other aquatic life taken, killed, or injured. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Aquatic Resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 567) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, WAM/JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB98 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB572 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
SB572 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.