HI SB572 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the imposition of a criminal fine for violations of the State's aquatic resources law. Permits the department of land and natural resources to recommend community service that benefits the resource damaged when a person is ordered to perform community service in lieu of a fine. Allows for a fine up to $1,000 to be levied for all other aquatic life taken, killed, or injured. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Aquatic Resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
2021-02-19SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 567) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
2021-02-17SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
2021-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229.
2021-02-01SenateRe-Referred to WTL, WAM/JDC.
2021-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room 229.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to WTL, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB98 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback