HI SB572 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 165, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Office of Information Practices to adopt administrative rules regarding protection of state and county agency records subject to disclosure and other rules necessary to administer the Uniform Information Practices Act. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Information Practices.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12HouseAct 165, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279).
2017-07-12SenateAct 165, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279).
2017-05-04SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2017-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
2017-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
2017-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2017-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-27HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-17.
2017-04-27HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 76) as amended in (CD 1).
2017-04-27Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
2017-04-27SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 76).
2017-04-27HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Oshiro, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-27SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kim, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-27SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 4:00PM in conference room 325.
2017-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2017-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2017-04-24SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-17 10:20AM in conference room 325.
2017-04-20SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 10:50AM in conference room 325.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Kim, K. Rhoads.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto Chair; Oshiro, McDermott.
2017-04-07HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540).
2017-04-07SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2017-04-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 466).
2017-04-06HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-04-04HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan excused (2).
2017-04-04HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1573) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2017-03-29HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, McDermott.
2017-03-29HouseThe votes in JUD were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, McDermott.
2017-03-29HouseReconsideration of action taken on 3/15/17.
2017-03-24HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-29-17 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2017-03-15HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa.
2017-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-15-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2017-03-09HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 27
2017-03-09HousePass First Reading
2017-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 202) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-03-07SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-03-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
2017-03-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2017-03-03SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 707) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2017-02-27SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-27-17 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2017-02-16SenateRe-Referred to JDL.
2017-01-23SenateReferred to PSM, JDL.
2017-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback