HI SB568 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB568
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes gender or sex markers from limited purpose driver's licenses and limited purpose provisional driver's licenses.
Title
Relating To Driver's Licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 246) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB568 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
HB1245 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6
HB1245 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=568&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB568_.HTM |