HI HB1245 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1245
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes gender or sex markers from limited purpose driver's licenses and limited purpose provisional driver's licenses.
Title
Relating To Driver's Licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1245 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6
SB568 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
SB568 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1245&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1245_.HTM |