HI SB560 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB560
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts voting by mail uniformly across all counties for all elections commencing in 2022. Establishes a limited number of voter service centers that would remain open from the tenth business day preceding an election through the day of the election to receive personal delivery of mail-in ballots, accommodate voters with special needs, offer same day registration and voting, and provide other election services. Allows for additional places of deposit for personal delivery of mail-in ballots. Appropriates funds for the implementation and administration of the election by mail system. Requires the office of elections to submit a report to the legislature prior to the convening of each regular session from 2020 through 2025, regarding the implementation of a vote by mail system. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 187) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1153) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 209) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-01-19 8:55AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB560 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB1248 (Same As) 2019-06-28 - Act 136, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1238).
HB1248 (Same As) 2019-06-28 - Act 136, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1238).