HI SB559 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB559
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires moorage fees for non-commercial mooring use permits at state small boat harbors to be determined by appraisal and set at fair market value. Establishes effective date for state small boat harbor moorage fee increases. Effective August 1, 2019.
Title
Relating To State Small Boat Harbors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB354 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB559 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
SB559 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=559&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB559_.HTM |