HI SB552 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 223, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1325).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revives for one year specified sections of the repealed chapter 514A, HRS, to allow developers whose condominium property regimes were issued an effective date pursuant to sections 514A-40 and 514A-41, HRS, to update their public reports without revising any of the associated documents and have their public reports and disclosure abstracts treated as non-expiring developer's public reports under part IV of chapter 514B, HRS. Clarifies that requirements regarding filing of public reports do not apply to duly registered time share projects under certain conditions. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Condominiums.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 223, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1325).
2019-07-09HouseAct 223, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1325).
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 25) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 25).
2019-04-17HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, C. Lee, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-17SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-16SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-19 2:30PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 901).
2019-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Takumi, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 743).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
2019-04-05HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2201) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-04-02HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:05PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-02HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-19 2:05pm.
2019-03-29HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-29HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-19 at 2:00pm.
2019-03-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-29-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-20HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1431) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Belatti.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 183) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-01SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 840) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Nishihara.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-20-19 10:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB811 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPH.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback