HI SB548 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB548
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a pharmacy to provide a customized patient medication package to any patient of an institutional facility or any member of the general public, subject to certain conditions.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB548 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to CPH.
HB220 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
HB220 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=548&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB548_.HTM |