HI SB548 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a general building contractor on construction projects involving more than four, rather than two, unrelated building trades or crafts. Allows a specialty contractor to take and execute a construction contract involving two or more crafts or trades without requiring the performance of the work to be incidental and supplemental.
Title
Contractors; General Building Contractors; Specialty Contractors
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=548&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB548_.HTM |