HI SB540 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows for lesser emergency period penalties to be adopted by the governor or a mayor. Allows for the emergency period infractions to be processed under the traffic adjudication process. Allows electronic copies of notices of infractions, infraction adjudication hearings, and notices of infraction judgments to be sent via electronic mail. Grants the district court concurrent jurisdiction over emergency period rule infractions committed by minors. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Emergency Rules.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16SenatePassed Final Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
2021-04-15SenateOne Day Notice 04-16-21.
2021-04-15SenateSenate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-16-21.
2021-04-15SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 521).
2021-04-13HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ohno excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-04-09HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21.
2021-04-09HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1837) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-03-30HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2021-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-30-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-24HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
2021-03-24HouseReported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1352) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-03-16HouseThe committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-23HouseReferred to PDP, JHA, referral sheet 17
2021-02-22HousePass First Reading
2021-02-19HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 24) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-02-19SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House.
2021-02-17Senate48 Hrs. Notice 02-19-21.
2021-02-17SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2021-02-17SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 291) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2021-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 9:15AM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01SenateRe-Referred to JDC.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1197 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to PDP, JHA, referral sheet 3

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback