HI HB1197 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Referred to PDP, JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows for lesser emergency period penalties to be adopted and promulgated by the governor or a mayor. Authorizes the county prosecutors to exercise discretion with the offense charged and the penalty sought for certain first-time violations of COVID-19 emergency orders incurred since March 4, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Emergency Rules.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-01HouseReferred to PDP, JHA, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-26HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB540 (Same As) 2021-04-13 - Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ohno excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback