HI SB540 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 222, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 222, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the board of pharmacy to approve pilot and demonstration projects for innovative applications in the practice of pharmacy under certain conditions. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Board Of Pharmacy.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 222, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 222, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 139) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 139). |
2019-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Takumi, B. Kobayashi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Takumi, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Har, Ward. |
2019-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 665). |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-04 | House | Deferred one day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2073), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1593), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Har, Mizuno. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:15PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1308) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 178) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 796) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB75 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).