HI SB531 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-20 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-20 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires premises licensed under chapter 281, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to have a sign posted on or about the premises, including but not limited to the women's restroom, that provides customers with a warning of the risks of birth defects and fetal alcohol spectrum disorders for women drinking alcohol during pregnancy. Takes effect 01/01/2014. (SD1)
Title
Warning Signs; Alcohol Consumption; Liquor Licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2013-02-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-02-15 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 26) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, Solomon). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-15-13. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 260) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-08-13 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Reported from HTH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 16) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HTH/PSM, CPN. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB404 (Same As) 2013-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Tokioka excused (2).