HI SB524 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:40PM in Conference Room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:40PM in Conference Room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an agricultural development and food security program. Establishes state planning objectives to increase demand and access to locally grown foods. Establishes state planning objectives to increase production of locally grown foods. Makes appropriations. Effective July 1, 2030. (SB524 HD1)
Title
Agriculture; Food Security; Appropriations ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:40PM in Conference Room 224. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 4:10pm in Conference Room 224. |
2014-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday 04-25-14 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 719). |
2014-04-23 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Wooley, Tsuji, Onishi Co-Chairs; Lowen, Matsumoto. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41). |
2014-02-18 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 4:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 10:30AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Wooley, Tsuji, Onishi Co-Chairs; Lowen, Cheape. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Nishihara, Chair; Ige, Kouchi, Co-Chair(s); L. Thielen, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 530). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1504) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Woodson. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Choy, Hashem, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (6). |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported from AGR/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1043), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Brower. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/EDB on Thursday, 03-14-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to AGR/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 160) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 716) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 22) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-13 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to AGL, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB617 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.