HI SB520 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB520
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of polystyrene foam containers and serving of prepared foods using polystyrene foam containers statewide. Requires restaurants to charge customers 20 cents as a malama aina fee per take-out order. Authorizes the Department of Health to adopt rules to implement the prohibition and include within its administrative rules a requirement for prepared food vendors to educate their customers about proper disposal of nonreusable food containers and litter reduction. Effective 1/1/2020.
Title
Relating To Polystyrene Foam Containers.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB520 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Disposal of Nonreusable Prepared Food Containers
Litter Reduction
Polystyrene Foam Products
Prohibition
Litter Reduction
Polystyrene Foam Products
Prohibition
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=520&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB520_.HTM |