HI SB515 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB515
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends insurance coverage requirements for in vitro fertilization to allow for expanded applicability.
Title
Relating To In Vitro Fertilization Insurance Coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB515 (Carry Over) 2017-02-03 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
HB677 (Same As) 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB677 (Same As) 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=515&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB515_.HTM |