HI SB511 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Act 016, 4/16/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Act 016, 4/16/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the relationship between the Uniform Commercial Code article 4A and the federal Electronic Fund Transfer Act.
Title
Uniform Commercial Code Article 4A; Electronic Fund Transfer Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | Senate | Act 016, 4/16/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116). |
2013-04-17 | House | Act 016, on 4/16/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1116). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 422). |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1409), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Takayama. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:45PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1125), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Carroll, Har, McDermott. |
2013-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-13. |
2013-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-14-13 5:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 156). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 781) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from CPN/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 211) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-13 9:45AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPN/TEC, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB135 (Same As) 2013-02-08 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).