HI SB503 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB503
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning 07/01/2022, requires sellers to disclose whether the real property lies within the sea level rise exposure area designated by the Hawaii climate change mitigation and adaptation commission or its successor.
Title
Relating To Real Property Transactions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WTL, CPN. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB554 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB503 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WTL, CPN.
SB503 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WTL, CPN.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=503&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB503_.HTM |