HI SB502 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB502
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-21 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-21 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes discriminatory requirements for mandatory insurance coverage of in vitro fertilization procedures to create parity of coverage for same-sex couples, unmarried women, and male-female couples for whom male infertility is the relevant factor. (SB502 HD1)
Title
Relating To In Vitro Fertilization Insurance Coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | The conference committee deferred the measure. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs; Kidani, L. Thielen. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Takumi, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2017-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 557). |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Har, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, McDermott, Say, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting no (6) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1761), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Kobayashi, Tokioka, Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola. |
2017-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-31-17 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2017-03-30 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-17. |
2017-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1352), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-23 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Fukumoto. |
2017-03-23 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-23-17 2:05PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4). |
2017-03-17 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1142) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-03-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro. |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 181) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 688) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from CPH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 387) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB502 (Carry Over) 2017-04-21 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
HB664 (Same As) 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB664 (Same As) 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.