HI SB499 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB499
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the conviction of a crime by a person holding a license to practice professional engineering, architecture, land surveying, or landscape architecture in the State, that is substantially related to the qualifications, functions, and duties of the licensee constitutes a ground for disciplinary action by the State Board of Professional Engineers, Architects, Surveyors, and Landscape Architects. Allows the Board to suspend or revoke a convicted licensee's license or decline to reissue a license to a convicted licensee subject to certain conditions.
Title
Relating To Professional Engineers, Architects, Surveyors And Landscape Architects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 9:15AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB320 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB499 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
SB499 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Conviction of Crime
Disciplinary Action
Professional Engineers, Architects, Surveyors and Landscape Architects License
State Board of Professional Engineers, Architects, Surveyors, and Landscape Architects.
Disciplinary Action
Professional Engineers, Architects, Surveyors and Landscape Architects License
State Board of Professional Engineers, Architects, Surveyors, and Landscape Architects.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=499&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB499_.HTM |