HI SB499 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB499

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that the conviction of a crime by a person holding a license to practice professional engineering, architecture, land surveying, or landscape architecture in the State, that is substantially related to the qualifications, functions, and duties of the licensee constitutes a ground for disciplinary action by the State Board of Professional Engineers, Architects, Surveyors, and Landscape Architects. Allows the Board to suspend or revoke a convicted licensee's license or decline to reissue a license to a convicted licensee subject to certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Professional Engineers, Architects, Surveyors And Landscape Architects.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07SenateThe committee on CPN deferred the measure.
2023-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 9:15AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
2023-01-25SenateReferred to CPN, JDC.
2023-01-20SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB499 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
HB320 (Same As) 2023-01-25 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback