HI SB495 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB495

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Updates the laws on agricultural cooperative associations and consumer cooperative associations including operations as resale agents and conversions. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Agriculture.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-24SenateThe committee on CPN deferred the measure.
2021-02-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
2021-02-16SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 265) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to AEN, CPN.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1302 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB495 (Carry Over) 2021-02-24 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback