HI SB493 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB493
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates standards and procedures for income-withholding for purposes of enforcing restitution orders. Clarifies the priority of income withholding orders. Amends the definition of "debt" relating to the recovery of money owed to the State to include court-ordered restitution subject to civil enforcement. Removes the court's ability to revoke restitution ordered as part of the defendant's sentencing. Requires that any bail posted by a defendant be applied toward payment of any court-ordered restitution in the same case. Extends victims' access to adult probation records to include access to payment compliance records without a fee or surcharge. Takes effect on 1/7/2059. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Collection Of Restitution For Crime Victims.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 251) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB493 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB305 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB305 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2