HI SB492 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB492
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a zero net energy and zero net waste initiative program in the public utilities commission. Establishes a zero net energy and zero net waste advisory council. Designates property controlled by the natural energy laboratory of Hawaii authority as a microgrid demonstration project. Authorizes the transmission of electric power from one governmental agency's point of generation to another governmental agency's existing transmission lines within the boundaries of the Hawaii ocean science and technology park. Appropriates funds for the zero net energy and zero net waste initiative program.
Title
Relating To Energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EET/CPN, WAM/JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB329 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB492 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EET/CPN, WAM/JDC.
SB492 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EET/CPN, WAM/JDC.
Subjects
Advisory Council
Appropriation ($)
Initiative Program
Public Utilities Commission
Wheeling
Zero Net Energy
Zero Net Waste
Appropriation ($)
Initiative Program
Public Utilities Commission
Wheeling
Zero Net Energy
Zero Net Waste
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=492&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB492_.HTM |