HI SB48 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Includes coercion as a means of committing the offense of sex trafficking. Removes the criminal statute of limitations for sex trafficking and promoting prostitution. Designates solicitation of a minor for prostitution as a form of sex trafficking. Specifies that sex trafficking of a minor is a strict liability offense. Repeals the offense of solicitation of a minor for prostitution. Effective 5/1/2024. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Sex Trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23SenateThe committee on JDC deferred the measure.
2021-02-18SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-10SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 88) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
2021-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 3:00PM in conference room 225.
2021-01-22SenateReferred to HMS, JDC.
2021-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-21SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback