HI SB471 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB471

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the percentage of the land conservation fund that may be used for costs related to the operation, maintenance, and management of lands acquired by the fund. Increases the maximum dollar amount of the conveyance tax distribution to the land conservation fund. Appropriates funds from the land conservation fund for resource land acquisition. Effective 1/1/2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Land Conservation Fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB362 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB471 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WTL, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback