HI SB465 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB465
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to DOH for FY 2017-2018 to purchase an ambulance vehicle and for the costs of operating a 24-hour, 7-days-a-week, ambulance unit for the County of Kauai.
Title
Making An Appropriation For Emergency Medical Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM/CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB465 (Carry Over) 2017-01-25 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
HB446 (Same As) 2017-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB446 (Same As) 2017-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=465&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB465_.HTM |