HI SB460 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for fiscal biennium 2015-2017 for salary and employer-union health benefits trust fund costs for public employees in collective bargaining unit (2) and for certain employees excluded from collective bargaining. Effective date January 7, 2059. (CD1)
Title
Collective Bargaining; Cost Items; Salaries; Benefits; Collective Bargaining Unit (2); Appropriations ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 466) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-17-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB658 (Same As) 2015-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2