HI SB459 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB459
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 722).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 722).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds from the Hydrogen Fueling System Subaccount within the Public Utilities Commission Special Fund for the Zero-Emission Vehicle Fueling System Rebate Program. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Hydrogen Fueling System Subaccount.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 722). |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Wakai, Keohokalole Co-Chairs. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457). |
2024-03-22 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2024-03-20 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340). |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309. |
2023-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 3:46PM in conference room 325. |
2023-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 12:36PM in conference room 325. |
2023-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 10:35AM in conference room 325. |
2023-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-23 10:35AM in conference room 325. |
2023-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-26-23 10:35AM in conference room 325. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Nakashima, Cochran Co-Chairs; Hussey-Burdick, Ward. |
2023-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 904). |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Wakai, Keohokalole Co-Chairs. |
2023-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888). |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 739). |
2023-04-11 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Amato voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2123), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-04-03 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-03-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1). |
2023-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1530), recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-03-21 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Amato; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-21-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Perruso excused (1). |
2023-03-16 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1260) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-03-14 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso. |
2023-03-10 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-14-23 9:30AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-14-23 9:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 174) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1086) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/CPN. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 535) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/CPN. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Fevella. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 1:02PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM/CPN. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB459 (Carry Over) 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Hydrogen Fueling System Subaccount
Zero-emission Vehicle Fueling System Rebate Program
Hydrogen Fueling System Subaccount
Zero-emission Vehicle Fueling System Rebate Program