HI SB455 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB455
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC/PSM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC/PSM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends conditions under which two or more members of a board may attend an informational meeting or presentation on matters relating to official board business. Allows members of a county council to attend such meetings or presentations without limitation on the number of attendees.
Title
Relating To Community Meetings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC/PSM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL/PSM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB315 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB455 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JDL/PSM.
SB455 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JDL/PSM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=455&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB455_.HTM |