HI SB447 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB447
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that certain types of dissemination, distribution, republication, and use of campaign materials or the financing of such by any person shall not be considered a contribution to a candidate.
Title
Relating To Campaign Contributions And Expenditures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Campaign Expenditures
Campaign Material
Campaign Spending Commission Package
Coordinated Activity
Dissemination
Distribution
Republication
Campaign Material
Campaign Spending Commission Package
Coordinated Activity
Dissemination
Distribution
Republication
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=447&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB447_.HTM |