HI SB447 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the sunset provision relating to the one cent tax on naphtha fuel used in a power-generating facility.
Title
Sunset; Naphtha Fuel Tax; Power Generation
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Gary Hooser [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 367) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Hooser, Ihara, Kokubun, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-17-09 2:45 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-09 4:00pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to ENE, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |