HI SB445 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB445
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases civil penalties for the violation of various pollution provisions. Establishes and appropriates funds for an environmental health specialist position within the clean water branch of the department of health. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Pollution Abatement.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457). |
2024-03-22 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2024-03-20 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340). |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309. |
2023-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 2:41PM in conference room 016. |
2023-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-23 11:16AM in conference room 325. |
2023-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-26-23 10:55AM in conference room 325. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 840). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Tarnas, Cochran Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2023-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 904). |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Elefante, Aquino Co-Chairs; Richards. |
2023-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 888). |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 736). |
2023-04-11 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2125) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-31 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Poepoe, Alcos. |
2023-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-31-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1). |
2023-03-24 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1514), recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-03-21 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-21-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Perruso excused (1). |
2023-03-16 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1258) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-03-14 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso. |
2023-03-10 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-14-23 9:30AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-14-23 9:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to EEP, JHA, FIN , referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 172) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1116) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 90) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to AEN, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB445 (Carry Over) 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.