HI SB441 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB441
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that certain provisions of the Internal Revenue Code related to at-risk rules and deductions and to passive activity loss do not apply with respect to claims for the state low-income housing tax credit. Appropriates funds to establish one position in the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to oversee the Low-Income Housing Tax Credit Program.
Title
Relating To The Low-income Housing Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-19 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB441 (Carry Over) 2019-01-29 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=441&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB441_.HTM |