HI SB438 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Act 021, 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Act 021, 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the period for which an application shall be considered abandoned from two years to one year. Specifies the conditions under which applications for licenses and examinations will be deemed abandoned. Provides that the one-year period after which an application is considered abandoned cannot be extended. Provides that a licensing authority shall not be required to act on any abandoned application and that the licensing authority may destroy abandoned applications. Clarifies that an application submitted after an abandoned application shall be treated as a new application and that the applicant shall comply with any new licensing requirements in effect at the time of the new application.
Title
Relating To Professional And Vocational Licensing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Act 021, 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121). |
2023-04-19 | House | Act 021, on 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121). |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1915), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-29 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Nishimoto. |
2023-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-29-23 3:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2023-03-21 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1382), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-03-16 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-10 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by on Thursday, 03-16-23 2:30PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN , referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 170). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 801) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Abandonment
Application for Examination
Application for Licensure
Professional and Vocational Licensing
Application for Examination
Application for Licensure
Professional and Vocational Licensing