HI SB438 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB438
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Campaign Spending Commission to publish on its website the names of all noncandidate committees that fail to file a report or to correct a report within the time allowed by the Commission.
Title
Relating To The Failure To File A Report With The Campaign Spending Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 37). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 591) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB438 (Carry Over) 2017-03-07 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 26
HB281 (Same As) 2017-07-11 - Act 108, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1209).
HB281 (Same As) 2017-07-11 - Act 108, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1209).
Subjects
Campaign Spending Commission Package
Failure to File a Report
Fine
Publishing on Campaign Spending Commission Website
Second Preliminary General Report
Failure to File a Report
Fine
Publishing on Campaign Spending Commission Website
Second Preliminary General Report
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=438&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB438_.HTM |