HI SB436 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB436
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Re-Referred to PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Re-Referred to PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a county liquor commission to use 15% of fines assessed against liquor licensees to fund alcohol addiction treatment programs.
Title
Relating To Liquor Fines Collected Per Year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HTH, WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB436 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - Re-Referred to PSM, WAM.
HB163 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB163 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Educational and Enforcement Programs
Fines
Hawaii State Association of Counties Package
Liquor Commission
Fines
Hawaii State Association of Counties Package
Liquor Commission
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=436&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB436_.HTM |