HI SB436 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for an income tax credit amounting to 15 per cent of qualified clinical trial costs incurred, in any county with a population over 700,000, and 20 per cent in any county with a population of 700,000 or less. Establishes criteria to qualify for the tax credit. Caps credit at $ per clinical trial. (SB436 HD1)
Title
Clinical Trials; Tax Credit
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Takai excused (1). | |
2009-03-23 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1154) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Shimabukuro. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-20-09 9:00am in House conference room 329. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 161) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 676) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-02-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Chun Oakland, English, Fukunaga, Hee, Hooser, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui, Galuteria, Kidani, Kokubun. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-09 9:00am in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from HTH/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 335) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Nishihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Slom. | |
2009-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/EDT deferred the measure until 02-13-09 2:40 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH-EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-09 2:45 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) Re-Referred to HTH/EDT, WAM. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to HTH, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |