HI SB429 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB429
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a license to include a person's full legal name, date of birth, gender category, residence address, and license or identification card number. Includes a third option of gender identification for driver's license and state identification card applicants. Effective 7/1/2020.
Title
Relating To Gender Identification.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 137). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 818) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 359) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB429 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 27
HB1165 (Same As) 2019-07-01 - Act 148, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1250).
HB1165 (Same As) 2019-07-01 - Act 148, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1250).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=429&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB429_.HTM |